NY S05486 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits providers of health care coverage from requiring behavioral health providers to provide all products offered by the health care plan.
Title
Prohibits providers of health care coverage from requiring behavioral health providers to provide all products offered by the health care plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. George Amedore [R] | Sen. Simcha Felder [D] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] |
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-08 | Senate | AMENDED 5486A |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1284 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07846 (Same As) 2016-03-29 - REFERRED TO HEALTH