NY S05478 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-07 - SIGNED CHAP.421
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-07 - SIGNED CHAP.421
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the agreement among the states to elect the president by national popular vote; makes such provisions permanent.
Title
Relates to the agreement among the states to elect the president by national popular vote; makes such provisions permanent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.421 |
2016-11-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.44 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a6044 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2016-05-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.844 |
2016-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2015-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06044 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - substituted by s5478