NY S05475 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - PRINT NUMBER 5475B
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Ensures that construction and fabrication done off of a public work site for specific use only in a public work project be compensated at the prevailing wage rate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensures that construction and fabrication done off of a public work site for specific use only in a public work project be compensated at the prevailing wage rate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-28SenatePRINT NUMBER 5475B
2024-05-28SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2024-03-20SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LABOR
2023-05-17SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-05-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 5475A
2023-05-04SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR
2023-03-06SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A00373 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback