NY S05474 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to pilotage rates at Sandy Hook, Sands Point and Execution Rocks; increases rates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to pilotage rates at Sandy Hook, Sands Point and Execution Rocks; increases rates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-10-01 SIGNED CHAP.537
2010-09-20 DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2010-06-24 returned to senate
2010-06-24 passed assembly
2010-06-24 ordered to third reading rules cal.333
2010-06-24 substituted for a8325
2010-03-24 referred to transportation
2010-03-24 DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-03-24 PASSED SENATE
2010-03-18 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2010-03-17 2ND REPORT CAL.
2010-03-16 1ST REPORT CAL.272
2010-03-10 REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2010-01-06 REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
2010-01-06 returned to senate
2010-01-06 died in assembly
2009-07-16 referred to ways and means
2009-07-16 DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2009-07-16 PASSED SENATE
2009-06-02 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2009-06-01 2ND REPORT CAL.
2009-05-27 1ST REPORT CAL.470
2009-05-08 REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION

Same As/Similar To

A8325 (Same As) 2010-06-24 - substituted by s5474

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback