NY S05472 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires every residential lease to provide notice of information concerning flood insurance.
Title
Requires every residential lease to provide notice of information concerning flood insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.69 |
2022-12-23 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.768 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.539 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a7876a |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2022-05-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5472A |
2022-05-23 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2022-05-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.703 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-05-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.694 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07876 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - substituted by s5472a