NY S05469 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-15 - PRINT NUMBER 5469B
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-15 - PRINT NUMBER 5469B
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits settlement agreements in any claim involving sexual harassment or any other form of discrimination prohibited by law from containing any condition that requires the complainant to pay the defendant liquidated damages in the event that the plaintiff violates any nondisclosure agreement included in such settlement agreement.
Title
Prohibits settlement agreements in any claim involving sexual harassment or any other form of discrimination prohibited by law from containing any condition that requires the complainant to pay the defendant liquidated damages in the event that the plaintiff violates any nondisclosure agreement included in such settlement agreement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5469B |
2020-07-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5469A |
2019-05-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00849 (Same As) 2020-07-15 - print number 849d