NY S05468 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2530
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2530
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a commission on prison education to study and develop a plan for improving education in state prisons.
Title
Establishes a commission on prison education to study and develop a plan for improving education in state prisons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2530 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.988 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A02530 (Same As) 2021-11-03 - signed chap.557