NY S05455 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.339
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.339
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Bradley M. Fuerst to participate in the optional 20 year retirement plan for police officers covered under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.
Title
Authorizes Bradley M. Fuerst to participate in the optional 20 year retirement plan for police officers covered under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.339 |
2015-09-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.481 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a7819a |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2015-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1633 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5455A |
2015-05-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2015-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |