NY S05453 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH
Pending: Senate Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH
Pending: Senate Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the twelve member rural suicide prevention council to examine the causes of rural suicides or attempts and to make recommendations for rural suicide reduction.
Title
Creates the twelve member rural suicide prevention council to examine the causes of rural suicides or attempts and to make recommendations for rural suicide reduction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2021-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1451 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5453A |
2021-05-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH |
2021-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07977 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to mental health