NY S05428 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to assault on a peace officer, police officer, firefighter, emergency medical services professional, sanitation enforcement agent or New York city sanitation worker.
Title
Relates to assault on a peace officer, police officer, firefighter, emergency medical services professional, sanitation enforcement agent or New York city sanitation worker.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1004 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5428A |
2018-01-22 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09751 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - referred to codes