NY S05425 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.335
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.335
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Penn Yan to convey certain real property to Keuka Outlet Development, LLC.
Title
Authorizes the village of Penn Yan to convey certain real property to Keuka Outlet Development, LLC.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.335 |
2015-09-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.622 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7551a |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1786 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5425A |
2015-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07551 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5425a