NY S05422 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.165
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the liability of the state to any person who suffers damage as a result of a defect in a state highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the liability of the state to any person who suffers damage as a result of a defect in a state highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-25AssemblyVETOED MEMO.165
2019-11-19SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading cal.223
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a1235
2019-06-20Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1822
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-30SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-04-30SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A01235 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s5422

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback