NY S05422 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on September 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.315
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to bioheating fuel requirements and bioheating fuel tax credits; requires all heating oil sold for use in any building in Nassau, Suffolk and Westchester counties on and after July 1, 2018 be bioheating fuel that contains at least five percent biodiesel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to bioheating fuel requirements and bioheating fuel tax credits; requires all heating oil sold for use in any building in Nassau, Suffolk and Westchester counties on and after July 1, 2018 be bioheating fuel that contains at least five percent biodiesel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-13AssemblySIGNED CHAP.315
2017-09-01SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-21Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.678
2017-06-21Assemblysubstituted for a6954a
2017-06-21Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2017-06-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-21SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2165
2017-06-21SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-06-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 5422A
2017-06-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2017-05-09SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2017-03-27SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A06954 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s5422a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05422&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05422&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05422
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05422&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05422A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5422#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5422#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5422#SF1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05422&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback