NY S05418 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the tax exemption amount on clothing and apparel items from one hundred ten dollars to two hundred dollars.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the tax exemption amount on clothing and apparel items from one hundred ten dollars to two hundred dollars.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
2023-05-23SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-03-03SenateREFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE

Same As/Similar To

A10024 (Same As) 2024-05-01 - referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback