NY S05411 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - signed chap.217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - signed chap.217
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending certain provisions authorizing banks and trust companies to exercise the rights of national banks to September 10, 2024.
Title
Relates to extending certain provisions authorizing banks and trust companies to exercise the rights of national banks to September 10, 2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | signed chap.217 |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.900 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5411 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-06 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-06 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.562 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-13 | Senate | referred to banks |
2019-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7604 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.900 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A07604 (Same As) 2019-08-30 - signed chap.217