NY S05399 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a courtroom or waiting area shall be a facility for purposes of aggravated harassment of an employee by an inmate or a defendant.
Title
Provides that a courtroom or waiting area shall be a facility for purposes of aggravated harassment of an employee by an inmate or a defendant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-04-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.872 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-04-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5399A |
2017-04-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2017-03-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A08076 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - enacting clause stricken
A07202 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
A07202 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes