NY S05396 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.575
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.575
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to powers of the agency; allows agency to exercise powers when its obligations are purchased by certain financial institutions.
Title
Relates to powers of the agency; allows agency to exercise powers when its obligations are purchased by certain financial institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.575 |
2011-09-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.613 |
2011-06-23 | Assembly | substituted for a7641 |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2011-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.824 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07641 (Same As) 2011-06-23 - substituted by s5396