NY S05386 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits sex offenders designated as level 2 or level 3, or whose victim was under 18 years, from entering or remaining upon school grounds, or upon the grounds of any facility or institution for the care or treatment of children under 18, while any such child remains upon the premises thereof; violation of such prohibition constitutes a class D felony.
Title
Prohibits sex offenders designated as level 2 or level 3, or whose victim was under 18 years, from entering or remaining upon school grounds, or upon the grounds of any facility or institution for the care or treatment of children under 18, while any such child remains upon the premises thereof; violation of such prohibition constitutes a class D felony.
Sponsors
Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. George Amedore [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] |
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1064 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1889 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08449 (Same As) 2017-09-27 - enacting clause stricken