NY S05383 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.139
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.139
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to statutory installment bonds and extending the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Relates to statutory installment bonds and extending the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.139 |
2017-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.300 |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | substituted for a6509 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.582 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06509 (Same As) 2017-05-15 - substituted by s5383