NY S05381 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.354
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.354
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Maine-Endwell central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Title
Permits the Maine-Endwell central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-02 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.354 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.347 |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a6380 |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-05-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.755 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06380 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - substituted by s5381