NY S05372 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A121A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the issuance of a New York State Afghanistan War Commemorative Medal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the issuance of a New York State Afghanistan War Commemorative Medal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-09SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A121A
2023-06-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1804
2023-06-08SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-18SenatePRINT NUMBER 5372A
2023-05-18SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2023-05-15SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-03-03SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS

Same As/Similar To

A00121 (Same As) 2023-11-10 - signed chap.610

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback