NY S05369 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - signed chap.625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes New York state history month from November to October.
Title
Changes New York state history month from November to October.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Senate | signed chap.625 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1034 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5369 |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2019-05-01 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-04-25 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.208 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2019-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6462 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1034 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06462 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - signed chap.625