NY S05367 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.410
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.410
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Saint John's Evangelical Lutheran Church to file an application for retroactive tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes Saint John's Evangelical Lutheran Church to file an application for retroactive tax exempt status.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Zeldin [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.410 |
2013-10-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.564 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7946 |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2013-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1074 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07946 (Same As) 2013-06-20 - substituted by s5367