NY S05357 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - approval memo.57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - approval memo.57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of "tenant" for the purposes of required notice during a mortgage foreclosure action.
Title
Expands the definition of "tenant" for the purposes of required notice during a mortgage foreclosure action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | approval memo.57 |
2020-12-23 | Senate | signed chap.354 |
2020-12-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.214 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5357 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.235 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.304 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2020-07-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6370 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.214 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.885 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06370 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - approval memo.57