NY S05352 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.411
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.411
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes future cemetery fund transfers from one cemetery located in the town of Bedford to other cemeteries in the town of Bedford and legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms the transfer of cemetery funds made by the town board of the town of Bedford from one cemetery in the town of Bedford to other cemeteries within such town.
Title
Authorizes future cemetery fund transfers from one cemetery located in the town of Bedford to other cemeteries in the town of Bedford and legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms the transfer of cemetery funds made by the town board of the town of Bedford from one cemetery in the town of Bedford to other cemeteries within such town.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.411 |
2014-10-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.264 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a7745a |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2014-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-03 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.739 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5352A |
2014-05-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1073 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07745 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - substituted by s5352a