NY S05348 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.238
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.238
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the one percent increased county sales tax for Putnam county for two years.
Title
Extends the one percent increased county sales tax for Putnam county for two years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.238 |
2023-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | home rule request |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.631 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a5764a |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-23 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2023-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.912 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5348A |
2023-04-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05764 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - substituted by s5348a