NY S05348 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities to contract for services through contracts let by any other governmental entity.
Title
Authorizes municipalities to contract for services through contracts let by any other governmental entity.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1150 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2021-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
Same As/Similar To
A04747 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in local governments