NY S05348 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - PRINT NUMBER 5348A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - PRINT NUMBER 5348A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires places of public accommodation, resort or amusement that operate televisions during regular hours of operation to provide closed captioning on certain televisions upon request.
Title
Requires places of public accommodation, resort or amusement that operate televisions during regular hours of operation to provide closed captioning on certain televisions upon request.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5348A |
2016-01-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2015-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A02035 (Same As) 2016-06-01 - REFERRED TO CODES