NY S05343 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows those submitting applications to the department of education under title eight of the education law to submit an affirmation in lieu of an oath.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows those submitting applications to the department of education under title eight of the education law to submit an affirmation in lieu of an oath.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-01AssemblySIGNED CHAP.306
2012-07-20SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-14Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.184
2012-06-14Assemblysubstituted for a8321
2012-03-14Assemblyreferred to codes
2012-03-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-03-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-03-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-03-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-03-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.311
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
2012-01-04Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-01-04Assemblydied in assembly
2011-06-15Assemblyreferred to higher education
2011-06-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2011-06-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2011-05-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2011-05-18Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2011-05-17Senate1ST REPORT CAL.748
2011-05-10SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A08321 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - substituted by s5343

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback