NY S05342 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the commissioner of health to issue certificates of public advantage.
Title
Extends the authority of the commissioner of health to issue certificates of public advantage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.80 |
2017-06-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.569 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a7748 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1146 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07748 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s5342