NY S05341 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.327
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.327
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to cider sold at retail for consumption.
Title
Relates to cider sold at retail for consumption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.327 |
2016-09-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.126 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a5580 |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.883 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2015-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A05580 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - substituted by s5341