NY S05335 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Yonkers to impose an additional one-half of one percent sales tax to be used for the support of education.
Title
Authorizes the city of Yonkers to impose an additional one-half of one percent sales tax to be used for the support of education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1221 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06881 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means