NY S05333 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-31 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the state to convey certain forest preserve land; provides such sale shall be subject to legislative approval and the proceeds of such conveyance shall be used for acquisitions to the forest preserve.
Title
Authorizes the state to convey certain forest preserve land; provides such sale shall be subject to legislative approval and the proceeds of such conveyance shall be used for acquisitions to the forest preserve.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2022-05-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2022-05-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5333A |
2022-05-09 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-09 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2022-05-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.575 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2021-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-03-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.624 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.624 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2021-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00794 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - opinion referred to judiciary