NY S05329 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.408
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.408
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing insurance limits for certain for-hire vehicles; includes injury to or destruction of property under such limits.
Title
Relates to increasing insurance limits for certain for-hire vehicles; includes injury to or destruction of property under such limits.
Sponsors
Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] |
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. James Tedisco [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.408 |
2019-10-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.195 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a7789 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 5329A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1079 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07789 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.408