NY S05320 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CITIES 1
Pending: Senate Cities 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CITIES 1
Pending: Senate Cities 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows commuter vans to accept hails from prospective passengers in the street.
Title
Allows commuter vans to accept hails from prospective passengers in the street.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] |
Sen. Mike Martucci [R] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. James Sanders [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
Same As/Similar To
A01470 (Same As) 2022-01-12 - enacting clause stricken
A09731 (Same As) 2022-03-28 - referred to cities
A09731 (Same As) 2022-03-28 - referred to cities