NY S05317 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.332
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.332
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of the authorization of county of Chautauqua to impose additional 1/2% sales and use taxes until November 30, 2017; authorizes such county to increase the rate of such taxes to 1%, if county real property taxes are reduced by 3%.
Title
Extends the expiration of the authorization of county of Chautauqua to impose additional 1/2% sales and use taxes until November 30, 2017; authorizes such county to increase the rate of such taxes to 1%, if county real property taxes are reduced by 3%.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.332 |
2015-09-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.673 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7557a |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1785 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5317B |
2015-05-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5317A |
2015-05-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07557 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5317b