NY S05309 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10803
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the inspection and sale of seeds, agricultural liming materials and commercial fertilizer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the inspection and sale of seeds, agricultural liming materials and commercial fertilizer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A10803
2018-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1835
2018-06-05SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 5309B
2018-05-09SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-19Assemblyreferred to aging
2017-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-13SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 5309A
2017-05-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-05-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.777
2017-03-20SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE

Same As/Similar To

A10803 (Same As) 2018-08-13 - delivered to governor

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05309&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05309&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05309
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05309&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05309A
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05309&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05309B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5309#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5309#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5309#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5309#SC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5309#SF2

Bill Comments

feedback