NY S05309 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the sale, by counties, of delinquent tax liens on brownfields property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the sale, by counties, of delinquent tax liens on brownfields property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2014-05-19SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2014-05-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2014-05-13Senate1ST REPORT CAL.621
2014-01-08SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2013-06-21SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2013-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2013-06-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2013-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.823
2013-05-16SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A07470 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to real property taxation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback