NY S05309 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - VETOED MEMO.47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates court attendants in the town of Highlands as peace officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates court attendants in the town of Highlands as peace officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-08-17AssemblyVETOED MEMO.47
2011-08-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2011-06-17Assemblyreturned to senate
2011-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2011-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.409
2011-06-17Assemblysubstituted for a7436
2011-06-14Assemblyreferred to codes
2011-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2011-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2011-06-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1249
2011-06-13SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2011-05-04SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A07436 (Same As) 2011-06-17 - substituted by s5309

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback