NY S05304 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Names the wood frog the official amphibian of the state of New York.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Names the wood frog the official amphibian of the state of New York.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateRECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
2019-04-24SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07303 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - referred to governmental operations
S05399 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback