NY S05303 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-25 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-25 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to creating the racing fan advisory council.
Title
Relates to creating the racing fan advisory council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2016-02-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-02-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.104 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2015-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1186 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5303A |
2015-05-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2015-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A08216 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to racing and wagering