NY S05299 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1741A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1741A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any third-party payments, financial assistance, discount, voucher or other price reduction instrument for out-of-pocket expenses made on behalf of an insured individual for the cost of prescription drugs to be applied to the insured's deductible, copayment, coinsurance, out-of-pocket maximum, or any other cost-sharing requirement when calculating such insured individual's overall contribution to any out-of-pocket maximum or any cost-sharing requirement.
Title
Requires any third-party payments, financial assistance, discount, voucher or other price reduction instrument for out-of-pocket expenses made on behalf of an insured individual for the cost of prescription drugs to be applied to the insured's deductible, copayment, coinsurance, out-of-pocket maximum, or any other cost-sharing requirement when calculating such insured individual's overall contribution to any out-of-pocket maximum or any cost-sharing requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1741A |
2022-05-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5299A |
2022-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.762 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-05-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.576 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01741 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - approval memo.54