NY S05283 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes registration as an organ donor in the donate life registry on SUNY, CUNY and library card applications.
Title
Authorizes registration as an organ donor in the donate life registry on SUNY, CUNY and library card applications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2018-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.116 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-15 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2017-05-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5283C |
2017-05-08 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-05-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.689 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-04-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5283B |
2017-04-28 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2017-03-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5283A |
2017-03-23 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2017-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08116 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - held for consideration in higher education