NY S05254 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for accidental disability retirement for deputy sheriffs in Nassau county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for accidental disability retirement for deputy sheriffs in Nassau county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A6081
2023-06-01SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1492
2023-06-01SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-04-17SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-02-28SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06081 (Same As) 2023-12-08 - signed chap.688

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback