NY S05251 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to purchasing on the behalf of a school district or a board of cooperative educational services.
Title
Relates to purchasing on the behalf of a school district or a board of cooperative educational services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.2 |
2017-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.90 |
2017-07-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.493 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a6910b |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5251B |
2017-06-15 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2017-06-15 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2017-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.794 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5251A |
2017-04-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-03-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06910 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5251b