NY S05250 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the requirement for policyholders to provide 30 days notice to withdraw from the state insurance fund.
Title
Relates to the requirement for policyholders to provide 30 days notice to withdraw from the state insurance fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5250A |
2016-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.620 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1110 |
2015-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A07742 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - reported referred to rules