NY S05250 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - referred to children and families
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the office of children and family services to study and report on the availability of child day care for working parents.
Title
Directs the office of children and family services to study and report on the availability of child day care for working parents.
Sponsors
Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Klein [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2014-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.947 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2013-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1289 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5250A |
2013-06-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2013-05-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07898 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to children and families