NY S05247 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the repeal date of the additional mortgage recording tax in Cattaraugus county until December 1, 2023.
Title
Extends the repeal date of the additional mortgage recording tax in Cattaraugus county until December 1, 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.512 |
2021-10-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.446 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a6159 |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-26 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1199 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06159 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s5247