NY S05244 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.134
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.134
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a residential work real property tax exemption in certain cities, over a period of 11 years, for owner occupied property which has been abandoned or condemned.
Title
Establishes a residential work real property tax exemption in certain cities, over a period of 11 years, for owner occupied property which has been abandoned or condemned.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.134 |
2017-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.542 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7116a |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5244A |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.793 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07116 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5244a