NY S05238 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for release of subcontractor's retainage held by a public owner or contractor sixty days after substantial completion of work.
Title
Provides for release of subcontractor's retainage held by a public owner or contractor sixty days after substantial completion of work.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5238A |
2018-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.901 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05344 (Same As) 2018-01-12 - print number 5344a